Responsive image

Mob:+91-8699133400

Vandana's Hobby & Tuition Classes

Responsive image

Criss-Cross Method of Multiplication in Vedic Maths



Method

We have a similar system of multiplication to the traditional system but it is much faster.

Example 1

Responsive image




EXAMPLE of 2 digit numbers where there is carry over involved.

Multiply 23 X 14

Answer : 23 X 14 = 322

Step 1 Multiply 3 X 4 =12 Write 2 and carry 1.

Step 2 Multiply (2 X 4) and add it to (3 X 1). Now add 1 which is carried over. It come out 12. write 2 and carry over 1. The answer at this stage is (....22)

Step 3 Last multiply 2X1 and add 1 which is carried over.

Answer: 322

MULTIPLICATION PROCESS INVOLVED IN MULTIPLYING THREE DIGIT NUMBERS WITH THREE DIGIT NUMBER

Responsive image


Thus it is clear that the product obtained by three digit multiplying can be obtained in one step.

Let us quickly have a look at how to multiply 3-digit numbers where carry over is involved.

Example :

Multiply 124 X 355

Answer: 44020

Step 1 We multiply (4 X 5) = 20. write 0 and carry 2. Answer (........0)

Step 2 ((2 X5) is 10 plus (4 X 5) is 20. Total is 30. Add 2 which is carried over and it come 32. Write 2 and carry 3. Answer is (.......20)

Step 3.Add (1X5), (2X5) and (4X3) 5+10+12= 27 and add 3 carried over. It come 30. Write 0 and carry 3. Answer is (.............020)

Step 4 Add (3 X 2) and (1 X 5). Total is 11. Now add 3 Carried over. Final is 14. write 4 and carry 1. Answer (......4020)

Step 5. (1 X 3) is 3. Add 1 carried over. it comes 4. Answer (44020)

Exercise:

343 X 507

415 X 905

666 X 333

395 X 275

MULTIPLICATION OF HIGHER-ORDER NUMBERS

We have seen 2-digit and 3-digit number multiplcation. We can expand the same logic and multiply bigger numbers.

Let us look at how to multiply 4-digit numbers.

STEPS INVOLVED IN MULTIPLYING 4-DIGIT NUMBERS:

Responsive image

Exercise:

Multiply:

1111 X 1111

2222 X 2222

2104 X 3072

6342 X 2009

6578 X 2068
MULTIPLICATION OF NUMBERS WITH AN UNEQUAL NUMBER OF DIGITS.

Let us suppose you want to multiply 546 X 2106. We have one number which has 3 digits and the other number has 4 digits.For such multiplication which technique will you use.?

Its very simple, to write 546 you will write 0546 and then multiply by 2106.

Responsive image

MULTIPLICATION TECHNIQUE FOR 5, 6 DIGIT NUMBERS.

Responsive image

Base Method of Multiplication






Vandana Sachar

About the Author

"Vandana Sachar, M.A. Eco, teaching Vedic Maths for the last 15 years"

Powered by - Ad Bazzaar